**ROULETTE**

**KEYS:**

**STRAIGHT UP**: A straight up bet pays 35 to one. If you multiply 35 by 2 you get 70,

Take the 0 away and you have 7. 7 is much easier to multiply than

35. So anytime you have an even number of straight ups divide the

bet in half , multiply by 7 and add a Zero.

Example: the bet is 12 straight up ( dream on Scott )

half of 12 is 6

6 x 7 = 42

The bet pays 420

Simple, even for a Lump

**EVEN NUMBER OF STRAIGHT UPS AND SPLITS**;

Example, 4 straight up and 4

Splits

Divide the straight up bet in half – 2

Then add both bets together - 8

The bet pays 208

Another example ; 8 straight up and 8 splits

Divide the straight up bet in half - 4

Add both bets together - 16

The bet pays - 416

If you can remember it this is a very helpful key. A lot of players play equal amounts on splits and straight ups. My problem is that whenever I do get the bet I can’t remember the key, so I end up having to add the two together, 280 and 136, not always that easy but I get there eventually.

**STREETS**( 11 TO 1 ) ; One to 9 is obvious even for a lump. But two digits?

Stump a lump !

This one is for just for you....

Add the first number to the second number and move the

second number over.

12 pays 132

13 pays 143

15 pays 165

GOT IT YET ?

An even easier method when adding multiple bets together is to not even calculate the streets, After you have added all other bets together count the number of streets and add that to your total, that’s the “slush number”. Now multiply that amount by 10 and add that to your total.

Example : The bet is 5 straight up 3 splits and 4 streets.

175 + 51 is 226

226 + 4 is 230

230 + 40 is 270

Much easier than trying to add the 226 and then figuring out 4 streets

equals 44 then adding 44 to 226.

Of all the keys I have learned this is the one I use the most. Save your streets till last and you’ll never have to figure one out.

Straight Ups pay 35:1

Number of straight up chips divided by 2 x 7. Example 16/2=8x7=56. When dealing with larger numbers using this key, you would add a zero to the end of the number. Correct answer is 560. Whenever you have an odd number of straight ups, either round it up or down 1 number to make it even and use the key again. Remembering to add or subtract 35 from the total, to accommodate for rounding up or down 1 to make the number even.

The trickiest to learn is the splits, paying 17:1. There is no real trick or key to figuring splits out as slick as what the straight up key allows. With these you're best to know your times table from 1-10 x 17 cold. This will allow for you to double that number whenever you have more than 10 splits to pay out. Also remembering 17x17=289 will come in handy to memorize.

The real secret to math is not to become overwhelmed by these huge numbers in figuring out what the total is! I feel most people struggle with this and, is why they hate math to begin with.

I always explain to people to take out what they know and break it down accordingly. 90-95% of the time, no one at your roulette table is going to know the payout prior to you anyway! So take out what you know and pay it off to yourself first and then stack the chips up properly for approval prior to sending it out to the winner.

Example: 23 straight ups, 27 splits, 15 corners and 7 streets is the payout. Odds in order 35:1, 17:1, 8:1 and 11:1 for the streets bet which covers any 3 numbers across on the roulette layout and, is usually placed along the line separating the dozens from the inside numbers.

Working with 23, I would break that down as 350,350 and 105=805 total (10x35,10x35,3x35) Using the key would be 22/2=11x7=77 add a zero to the end which totals 770 and finally add 35 to that answer to accomodate for dropping 1 from the actual total of 23 chips straight up.

27 splits, well I know 17x17=289 and 10x17=170, so when adding these 2 figures together I further break it down to a more manageable number to work with. Example is to drop 200 and 100 from the 2 totals and add those back in later. Now I have 89 and 70. So if you're comfortable in working with these 2 numbers then do so. If not you can round 89 to 90 and then add 9+7 = 16. Add a zero onto this number and you have 160. Subtract 1 from the 160 for rounding up 89 to 90 and that total is 159. Now add back the 200 and 100 we took out when first starting and you have 300 + 159 = 459 as your answer. I know this will look and sound confusing, however, once you start to train your mind in taking out what you know from math equations. It will become more and more easier to recognize what works best for you.

15 corners pays 8:1, so I know 10 = 80 and 5 is half of that, so 80+40=120 total.

And finally 7 streets, pays 11:1, 7x11=77 total.

As a dealer, I would bring out the chips as I came to a conclusion for each number in the working area. It's somewhat cheating as a dealer to do so, but, any supervisor, pit manager as well as casino upper management will appreciate the right answer, rather than the wrong answer trying to remember each total and add them up in your head. Payout totals I would round up 459 to 460 and 77 to 80 adding 4 in total which would look like the following: 805, 460, 120 and 80= 1465-4= 1461 pieces.

I hope this helps give you a clearer understanding of how to use the math in coming up with the correct total. Also, that it provides some insight as how to break the big numbers down and take out what you know when answering an equation, so not to become overwhelmed, putting added pressure on yourself!

Number of straight up chips divided by 2 x 7. Example 16/2=8x7=56. When dealing with larger numbers using this key, you would add a zero to the end of the number. Correct answer is 560. Whenever you have an odd number of straight ups, either round it up or down 1 number to make it even and use the key again. Remembering to add or subtract 35 from the total, to accommodate for rounding up or down 1 to make the number even.

The trickiest to learn is the splits, paying 17:1. There is no real trick or key to figuring splits out as slick as what the straight up key allows. With these you're best to know your times table from 1-10 x 17 cold. This will allow for you to double that number whenever you have more than 10 splits to pay out. Also remembering 17x17=289 will come in handy to memorize.

The real secret to math is not to become overwhelmed by these huge numbers in figuring out what the total is! I feel most people struggle with this and, is why they hate math to begin with.

I always explain to people to take out what they know and break it down accordingly. 90-95% of the time, no one at your roulette table is going to know the payout prior to you anyway! So take out what you know and pay it off to yourself first and then stack the chips up properly for approval prior to sending it out to the winner.

Example: 23 straight ups, 27 splits, 15 corners and 7 streets is the payout. Odds in order 35:1, 17:1, 8:1 and 11:1 for the streets bet which covers any 3 numbers across on the roulette layout and, is usually placed along the line separating the dozens from the inside numbers.

Working with 23, I would break that down as 350,350 and 105=805 total (10x35,10x35,3x35) Using the key would be 22/2=11x7=77 add a zero to the end which totals 770 and finally add 35 to that answer to accomodate for dropping 1 from the actual total of 23 chips straight up.

27 splits, well I know 17x17=289 and 10x17=170, so when adding these 2 figures together I further break it down to a more manageable number to work with. Example is to drop 200 and 100 from the 2 totals and add those back in later. Now I have 89 and 70. So if you're comfortable in working with these 2 numbers then do so. If not you can round 89 to 90 and then add 9+7 = 16. Add a zero onto this number and you have 160. Subtract 1 from the 160 for rounding up 89 to 90 and that total is 159. Now add back the 200 and 100 we took out when first starting and you have 300 + 159 = 459 as your answer. I know this will look and sound confusing, however, once you start to train your mind in taking out what you know from math equations. It will become more and more easier to recognize what works best for you.

15 corners pays 8:1, so I know 10 = 80 and 5 is half of that, so 80+40=120 total.

And finally 7 streets, pays 11:1, 7x11=77 total.

As a dealer, I would bring out the chips as I came to a conclusion for each number in the working area. It's somewhat cheating as a dealer to do so, but, any supervisor, pit manager as well as casino upper management will appreciate the right answer, rather than the wrong answer trying to remember each total and add them up in your head. Payout totals I would round up 459 to 460 and 77 to 80 adding 4 in total which would look like the following: 805, 460, 120 and 80= 1465-4= 1461 pieces.

I hope this helps give you a clearer understanding of how to use the math in coming up with the correct total. Also, that it provides some insight as how to break the big numbers down and take out what you know when answering an equation, so not to become overwhelmed, putting added pressure on yourself!

**PICTURE BETS**

Picture bets are a roulette dealers best kept secret. They are the ‘trick’ to being able to add up bets quickly.

Instead of adding up chips, learn the patterns of chips you see on the layout. See the ‘picture’ of them laid out in front of you.

**For example:**

You see a chip in the straight up position, and a chip in the split position.

The straight up chip pays 35, the split chip pays 17.

35 + 17 = 52

There, you’ve learned your first picture bet.

Most picture bets have names, to help you remember them. This picture bet is called Deck of Cards, because there are 52 cards in a deck.

Remembering that this combination of chips pays 52 means you’ll never have to add 35 and 17 ever again. Cool huh?

There are lots of picture bets, and the more you learn, the quicker you’ll be at adding up bets.

**Here is another way of using the Deck of Cards (52) picture bet:**

You see 5 chips in the straight up position, and 5 chips in the split position.

Here’s the difficult way of working out this payout:

5 x 35 = 175

5 x 17 = 85

175 + 85 = I have no clue, my brain is frozen!

What do you do? People are staring at you, waiting for the answer, and you’re a deer in headlights! The office job you left for this fun and exciting casino career is looking great right about now!

Don’t panic. Let’s get the answer by using the Deck of Cards 52 picture bet.

Here’s how this will work:

1. Take the 52 picture bet and times it by 10, because that is easy math. Now you have 10 chips in each position.

2. Cut that answer in half to get the answer to 5 chips in each position. Here’s the math:

- 52 x 10 = 520
- 520 divided by 2 = 260

**Let’s take this just one step further.**

Here’s the bet:

5 straight ups and 4 splits.

5 x 35 = 175

4 x 17 = 68

175 + 68 = Aargh!!!

Let’s do it the easy way. You already know that 5 straight ups and 5 splits are 260. Just take one split (17) from 260.

260 – 17 = 243.

Done!

Oh yeah, I LOVE picture bets!

We plan on filming our own video soon, until then this one is good.